MA H466 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4880
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to annual reports of public charities. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Concerning annual reports of public charities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4880 |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H447 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H1293 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S780
S1102 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1293 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S780
S1102 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H466 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H466.pdf |