MA H1254 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S771

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to comprehensive transparency in the pharmaceutical industry. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to promoting comprehensive transparency in the pharmaceutical industry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-17SenateAccompanied S771
2021-06-29JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S736 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S2436 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - House concurred
H1261 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S60 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S795 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2162 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2205 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2044 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S194 (Similar To) 2021-07-13 - Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1060 (Similar To) 2021-07-27 - Hearing scheduled for 08/03/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1208 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1217 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2172 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - House concurred
S2144 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S631 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2173 (Similar To) 2021-10-26 - Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S771 (Replaced by) 2021-11-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback