MA H1248 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Barrows of Mansfield, a petition of F. Jay Barrows that the Executive Office of Health and Human Services produce annually lists of employers who have 50 or more employees using public health assistance. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to provide immediate relief to businesses on health care costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5201 |
2021-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S2165 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2536 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H346 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S2051 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied H3121
S2256 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2981
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S153 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1465 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
H5201 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2536 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
H346 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S2051 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied H3121
S2256 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2981
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S153 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1465 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
H5201 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1248 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1248.pdf |