MA H1248 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Beaton of Shrewsbury, a petition of Matthew A. Beaton, Bradley H. Jones, Jr. and Benjamin Swan for an investigation by a special commission of the condominium laws. Housing.
Title
Relative to a Special Commission to Study Condominium Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-05-24 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2012-02-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint committee on Rules |
2012-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1248 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12802&generalCourtId=1 |