MA H1240 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5209
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize certain high school students to attend community college free of tuition and fees. Higher Education.
Title
To address the degree gap and reduce student debt
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5209 |
2020-11-25 | House | House concurred |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-18 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H477 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H400 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H439 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S771 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1582 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S235 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5209 (Replaced by) 2020-12-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H400 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H439 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S771 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1582 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S235 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5209 (Replaced by) 2020-12-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1240 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1240.pdf |