MA H1219 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-12)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to creating higher education opportunities for students with intellectual disabilities, autism, and other developmental disabilities. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating higher education opportunities for students with intellectual disabilities, autism, and other developmental disabilities

Sponsors

Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]
Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]
Rep. Randy Hunt [R]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Sen. Dean Tran [R]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H1218 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H477 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H481 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Senate concurred
H1208 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H8 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S762 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S1055 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1724 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S759 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S761 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S755 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S768 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback