MA H1218 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-13)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to creating higher education opportunities for students with intellectual disabilities, autism, and other developmental disabilities who have exited special education. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating higher education opportunities for students with intellectual disabilities, autism, and other developmental disabilities who have exited special education

Sponsors

Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]
Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Randy Hunt [R]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]
Rep. James Kelcourse [R]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H1219 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H477 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H481 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Senate concurred
H1208 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H8 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S762 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S1055 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1724 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S759 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S761 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S755 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S768 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback