MA H1162 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the pricing of prescription drugs. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote transparency in prescription drug prices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-03-27JointHearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H1913 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H898 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1972 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1860 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H253 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H3489 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1149 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S570 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S721 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1167 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S552 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2397 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Reprinted as amended, see S2409
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback