MA S570 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2543

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to out-of-pocket expenses for prescription drug coverage. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to out-of-pocket expenses for prescription drug coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2543
2019-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H3217 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H898 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1972 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H2834 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H1860 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S49 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2724
H2191 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1984 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback