MA H1972 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4449

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the wholesale importation of prescription drugs into the Commonwealth. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To permit the wholesale importation of prescription drugs into the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4449
2019-08-28JointHearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1913 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H898 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H755 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H1860 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1162 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1149 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S570 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S721 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S582 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S552 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1167 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H916 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2397 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Reprinted as amended, see S2409
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4449 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Reported, in part, by H1886

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback