MA H1046 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to out-of-network billing for certain medical services. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to out-of-network billing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-16HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S607 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1312 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2768
S1664 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H972 (Similar To) 2019-10-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-07-06 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence
S1259 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2362 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2019 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2056 (Similar To) 2020-07-06 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback