MA H2362 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Robert T. Kilduff firefighters cancer network. Public Service.
Title
Pertaining to firefighter disability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-30 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2362 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2362.pdf |