MA H1041 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to compensation of certain employees on holidays. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to fast food employee holiday pay
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4729 |
2017-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S998 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1723 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S2165 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H32 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S16 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - See H58
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S998 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1723 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S2165 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H32 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S16 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - See H58
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1041 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1041.pdf |