MA H102 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4790
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4790
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4790
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for disposition of surplus state real property based on smart growth land use policies
Title
Providing for disposition of surplus state real property based on smart growth land use policies.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4790 | |
2009-03-02 | Senate concurred | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | |
2009-02-26 | Motion to reconsider prevailed | |
2009-01-29 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
Same As/Similar To
H4790 (Replaced by) 2010-06-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H102 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=6562&generalCourtId=2 |