KY SB378 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 98)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 98)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 49.010 and 49.020 to require trauma-informed training for staff and members of the Crime Victims Compensation Board.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Crime Victims Compensation Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Denise Harper Angel [D] | Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Gerald Neal [D] | Sen. Whitney Westerfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 502 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2188 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2188 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 98) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2022-03-30 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | returned to Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-24 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | received in House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |