KS HB2280 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of nursing; certified nurse-midwife.
Title
Board of nursing; certified nurse-midwife.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Rereferred to Committee on Taxation |
2015-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2015-02-10 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2280/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2280_00_0000.pdf |