IN SCR0043 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign the topic of the prescription of psychotropic medication to children under the care and supervision of the department of child services to the appropriate committee.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign the topic of the prescription of psychotropic medication to children under the care and supervision of the department of child services to the appropriate committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] |
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Stemler and Kirchhofer |
2017-04-13 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Davisson |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |