IN SB0602 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Independent review board. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the process by which a 1977 fund member is determined to be entitled to receive a disability benefit, including the advisability of requiring the Indiana public retirement system to establish a single independent review board for disability determinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Independent review board. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the process by which a 1977 fund member is determined to be entitled to receive a disability benefit, including the advisability of requiring the Indiana public retirement system to establish a single independent review board for disability determinations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2019-02-18SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-14SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Burton
2019-02-14SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 132: yeas 47, nays 0
2019-02-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07SenateSenator Kruse added as third author
2019-02-07SenateSenator Garten added as second author
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-28SenateSenator Tallian added as coauthor
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2019-01-15SenateAuthored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback