IN SB0503 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "retailer" and provides that the duties relating to the electronic tracking of ephedrine and pseudoephedrine (PSE) apply only to retailers. Requires a retailer to submit information relating to the purchase of nonprescription PSE to the National Precursor Log Exchange (NPLEx) administered by the National Association of Drug Diversion Investigators (NADDI) before completing a sale, and prohibits a retailer from completing a sale if NPLEx generates a "stop sale" notice. Provides that the maximum amount of PSE that may be purchased by an individual in a 30 day period is 7.2 grams. Requires PSE containing substances to be kept behind the counter, and specifies that the PSE weight limits apply to the base amount of PSE in the drug. Provides that a retailer who uses the electronic sales tracking system is liable for any negligent, reckless, deliberate, or wanton act or omission committed in carrying out the duties required by this section, and provides that a retailer may be liable to a third party for a violation of the duties required in using the electronic sales tracking system. Specifies that: (1) a law enforcement official may access Indiana transaction information contained in the NPLEx; (2) information contained in the NPLEx may be shared only with law enforcement officials; (3) NADDI may not modify information shared with law enforcement officials; and (4) NADDI shall forward Indiana data contained in the NPLEx at least one time per week to the state police department.
Title
Sale of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine.
Sponsors
Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. James Banks [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Lindel Hume [D] |
Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 18 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Skinner), failed (Y: 6 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-28 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 18 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Skinner), failed (Y: 6 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 221 | |
2011-05-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 492: yeas 41, nays 8 | |
2011-04-28 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 703: yeas 73, nays 5 | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-27 | Senator Arnold added as conferee | |
2011-04-27 | Senator Skinner removed as conferee | |
2011-04-21 | House advisors appointed: T. Brown, Yarde and Day | |
2011-04-21 | House conferees appointed: Foley and L. Lawson | |
2011-04-19 | Senate advisors appointed: Steele, R. Young and M. Young | |
2011-04-19 | Senate conferee appointed: Yoder and Skinner | |
2011-04-19 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Concurrence withdrawn | |
2011-04-12 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2011-04-08 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-08 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 452: yeas 78, nays 11 | |
2011-04-07 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-05 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-02-22 | Senator Banks added as coauthor | |
2011-02-22 | Senator Zakas added as coauthor | |
2011-02-22 | Cosponsor: Rep. Foley | |
2011-02-22 | House sponsor: Rep. L. Lawson | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 46 and nays 3 | |
2011-02-21 | Amendment 1 (Skinner), failed; Roll Call 181: yeas 13, nays 37 | |
2011-02-21 | Amendment 2 (Yoder), prevailed; | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-15 | Senator M. Young added as third author | |
2011-02-14 | Senator Hume added as coauthor | |
2011-01-20 | Senators Charbonneau and Arnold added as coauthors | |
2011-01-20 | Senator Steele added as second author | |
2011-01-20 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to the Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters. | |
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Senator Yoder |