IN SB0334 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - House advisors appointed: Huston, Behning, Brown T and Austin
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - House advisors appointed: Huston, Behning, Brown T and Austin
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Various education matters. Provides that the department of education (department) shall make random visits to at least 5% of schools that are eligible to receive choice scholarships during a particular school year. (Current law provides that the department shall make random visits to at least 5% of eligible schools and charter schools.) Specifies that if a choice scholarship student changes schools during the school year after the December 1 count of special education pupils, any choice scholarship amounts paid to the choice scholarship student for the remainder of the school year after the choice scholarship student enrolls in a different
Title
Various education matters. Provides that the department of education (department) shall make random visits to at least 5% of schools that are eligible to receive choice scholarships during a particular school year. (Current law provides that the department shall make random visits to at least 5% of eligible schools and charter schools.) Specifies that if a choice scholarship student changes schools during the school year after the December 1 count of special education pupils, any choice scholarship amounts paid to the choice scholarship student for the remainder of the school year after the choice scholarship student enrolls in a different
Sponsors
Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Earline Rogers [D] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] |
Sen. James Banks [R] | Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] |
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 27 N: 65 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Motion to recommit to the Committee on Ways and Means (Pelath) failed (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Behning) prevailed (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 27 N: 65 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Motion to recommit to the Committee on Ways and Means (Pelath) failed (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Behning) prevailed (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | House advisors appointed: Huston, Behning, Brown T and Austin |
2016-03-07 | House | House conferees appointed: DeVon and Smith V |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Kruse, Stoops and Banks |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Yoder and Rogers |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 339: yeas 60, nays 33 |
2016-03-02 | House | Amendment #3 (Smith V) motion withdrawn |
2016-03-02 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 327: yeas 27, nays 65 |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to recommit to the Committee on Ways and Means (Pelath) failed; Roll Call 326: yeas 28, nays 65 |
2016-03-02 | House | Amendment #2 (Behning) prevailed; Roll Call 325: yeas 87, nays 3 |
2016-03-02 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-22 | House | Representative Lehman added as cosponsor |
2016-02-18 | House | Representative Brown, T. added as cosponsor |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Huston |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senators Alting and Banks added as coauthors |
2016-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative DeVon |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Breaux) failed; voice vote |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Yoder) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yoder |