IN SB0329 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Representative Thompson added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Representative Thompson added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allocation of circuit breaker credits by schools. Extends for three additional years the statute allowing a school corporation to allocate circuit breaker credits proportionately under certain circumstances (without taking protected taxes into account). Provides that during these three additional years, a school corporation may allocate circuit breaker credits proportionately, without taking protected taxes into account, if the amount of circuit breaker credits against the school corporation's transportation fund levy is greater than 20% (rather than 10%, under current law) of the school corporation's transportation fund levy.
Title
Allocation of circuit breaker credits by schools. Extends for three additional years the statute allowing a school corporation to allocate circuit breaker credits proportionately under certain circumstances (without taking protected taxes into account). Provides that during these three additional years, a school corporation may allocate circuit breaker credits proportionately, without taking protected taxes into account, if the amount of circuit breaker credits against the school corporation's transportation fund levy is greater than 20% (rather than 10%, under current law) of the school corporation's transportation fund levy.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | House | Representative Thompson added as cosponsor |
2016-02-11 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Huston |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 108: yeas 47, nays 3 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second author |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mishler |