IN SB0327 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transparency portal. Requires a political subdivision to upload certain contracts to the Indiana transparency Internet web site during each year that the contract amount payable by the political subdivision for the year exceeds the lesser of: (1) 10% of the political subdivision's property tax levy; or (2) $50,000.
Title
Transparency portal. Requires a political subdivision to upload certain contracts to the Indiana transparency Internet web site during each year that the contract amount payable by the political subdivision for the year exceeds the lesser of: (1) 10% of the political subdivision's property tax levy; or (2) $50,000.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Scott Schneider [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Rep. John Price [R] |
Rep. Richard Hamm [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Public Law 142 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 232: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-02-22 | House | Representative Hamm added as cosponsor |
2016-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 210: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Price |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Schneider added as second author |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bassler |