IN SB0301 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce education. Requires the department of workforce development (DWD) to prepare an occupational demand report before July 1, 2016, regarding the expected workforce needs of employers for a 10 year projection and the training and education that will be required to meet those expected workforce needs. Requires the DWD to categorize these workforce needs and training and education requirements by job classification on a statewide basis and also for each region designated under the federal Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act of 2014 (WIOA). Provides that in preparing the labor market demand report and the average wage level report used in
Title
Workforce education. Requires the department of workforce development (DWD) to prepare an occupational demand report before July 1, 2016, regarding the expected workforce needs of employers for a 10 year projection and the training and education that will be required to meet those expected workforce needs. Requires the DWD to categorize these workforce needs and training and education requirements by job classification on a statewide basis and also for each region designated under the federal Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act of 2014 (WIOA). Provides that in preparing the labor market demand report and the average wage level report used in
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Randy Truitt [R] |
Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Public Law 141 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 369: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 401: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Truitt, Thompson and Errington |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Huston and Goodin |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Eckerty, Stoops and Raatz |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Kenley and Tallian |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 329: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2016-03-01 | House | Amendment #2 (Huston) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-03-01 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as coauthor |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Truitt and Goodin |
2016-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Huston |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as third author |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Eckerty) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second author |
2016-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kenley |