IN SB0093 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the failure to use due caution when approaching a stationary utility service vehicle that is being used to perform utility services or a stationary road, street, or highway maintenance vehicle is a Class A infraction that may also result in the loss of driving privileges. (Current law provides that the failure to use due caution which will result in sanctions pertains to the failure to use due caution when approaching a stationary recovery vehicle or a stationary highway maintenance vehicle.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Yield when approaching certain vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 14
2010-03-12 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-11 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-08 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-04 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-01 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 245: Yeas 35, Nays 10
2010-03-01 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2010-02-16 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2010-02-16 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 171: Yeas 94, Nays 0
2010-02-15 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-11 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2010-01-28 Cosponsor: Rep. Clements
2010-01-28 House sponsor: Rep. Austin
2010-01-28 Referred to the House
2010-01-28 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 55: Yeas 30 and Nays 18
2010-01-26 Senator Hume added as coauthor
2010-01-26 Senator Buck added as second author
2010-01-25 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-21 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback