IN HB1309 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Public Law 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Public Law 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pregnancy accommodation. Allows an employee to request an accommodation for the employee's pregnancy. Requires an employer to respond to an employee's request for an accommodation within a reasonable time frame. Provides that a request for accommodation does not require an employer to provide an accommodation for an employee's pregnancy, or impose a duty or obligation upon the employer to provide an accommodation or an exception to the employer's policies unless existing federal or state laws require that an accommodation must be made. Prohibits an employer from disciplining, terminating, or retaliating against an employee because the employee has requested or used an accommodation for the employee's pregnancy.
Title
Pregnancy accommodation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Qaddoura) failed (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #4 (Bauer) failed (Y: 30 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Qaddoura) failed (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #4 (Bauer) failed (Y: 30 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Public Law 87 |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senators Doriot and Kruse added as cosponsors |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 355: yeas 31, nays 19 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senator Zay added as third sponsor |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 328: yeas 13, nays 34 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 327: yeas 10, nays 37 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Alting and Boots |
2021-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 183: yeas 95, nays 2 |
2021-02-16 | House | Amendment #4 (Bauer M) failed; Roll Call 130: yeas 30, nays 68 |
2021-02-16 | House | Amendment #1 (Bartlett) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-16 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Negele, Barrett, Fleming |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Engleman |