IN HB1290 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds athletic trainers to the definition of "health care provider" for purposes of laws concerning hospitals and public health measures. Requires the department of education to disseminate guidelines, information sheets, and forms to school corporations, charter schools, public schools, and accredited nonpublic schools to inform and educate coaches, student athletes, and parents and legal guardians of student athletes of the nature and risk of sudden cardiac arrest. Requires that a form acknowledging receipt of the information sheet must be returned to the student athlete's coach each year before beginning practice for an athletic activity. Requires that a student athlete who is suspected of experiencing a symptom of sudden cardiac arrest must be removed from the athletic activity at the time the symptom is identified. Provides that the student athlete may not return to practice and play until the student athlete's parent or legal guardian has been informed and the parent or legal guardian has provided permission for the student to return to practice and play. Requires the commission on higher education to disseminate guidelines, information sheets, and forms to a postsecondary educational institution's athletic department to inform and educate coaches and student athletes of the nature and risk of sudden cardiac arrest. Requires that a form acknowledging receipt of the information must be returned to the student athlete's coach each year before beginning practice for an athletic activity. Requires that a student athlete who is suspected of experiencing a symptom of sudden cardiac arrest must be removed from the athletic activity at the time the symptom is identified. Provides that the student athlete may not return to practice and play until the student athlete has
Title
Health of student athletes.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Thomas Dermody [R] | Rep. Scott Pelath [D] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] |
Rep. Gregory Porter [D] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Timothy Skinner [D] |
Sen. Jean Leising [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 129003 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 129001 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 129003 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 129001 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 139 |
2014-03-12 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Becker added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 429: yeas 86 and nays 6 |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Battles added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Dermody added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Huston added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative VanDenburgh added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Bacon added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 324: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Leising added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1290 Amendment #3 (Leising), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Breaux added as third sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Becker added as second sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Kruse added as first sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 198: yeas 87 and nays 9 |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1290 Amendment #1 (Bacon), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Porter added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative McNamara added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Pelath added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | Representative Dermody added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Bacon. |