IN HB1116 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a state educational institution to adopt a policy to award educational credit to an individual who is enrolled in a state educational institution and successfully completes courses that: (1) are part of the individual's military service; (2) meet the standards of the American Council on Education for awarding academic credit; and (3) meet the state educational institution's role, scope, and mission. Requires that the commission for higher education must adopt rules that establish uniform guidelines for state educational institutions to follow when implementing the requirements. Provides that an occupational or professional licensure board shall issue a license, certificate, registration, or permit to a military service applicant or military spouse who meets certain requirements. Allows a board to issue a temporary practice permit or provisional license while the military service applicant or military spouse is satisfying certain requirements as determined by the board.
Title
Military education and training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 351: yeas 79, nays 0 | |
2012-02-29 | Senators Alting and Paul added as cosponsors | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 275: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-02-27 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 1 (Lanane), failed; Roll Call 243: yeas 13, nays 36 | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 2 (Glick), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Senator Tomes added as third sponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Senator Waterman added as second sponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Senator Tomes removed as second sponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Senator Glick added as first sponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Senator Waterman removed as first sponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Senator Glick removed as cosponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-09 | Senator Glick added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2012-01-30 | Representative Bartlett added as coauthor | |
2012-01-27 | Senate sponsors: Senators Waterman and Tomes | |
2012-01-27 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-27 | Representative Koch added as coauthor | |
2012-01-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 91: yeas 90, nays 0 | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Borders |