IN HB1110 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes to provisions concerning child welfare, including: (1) the contents of notices sent out by the director of the department of natural resources to individuals who are delinquent in paying child support; (2) the definition of "relative" for purposes of provisions concerning residential child care, collaborative care, the placement of children who are children in need of services, and juvenile delinquency; (3) the issuance and implementation of income withholding orders; (4) information reviewed by the residential placement committee; (5) the disclosure of reports and other materials concerning investigations and reports of children who are or are alleged to be children in need of services and child fatalities or near fatalities; and (6) the placement of children who are or alleged to be children in need of services. Makes a technical correction. Repeals a provision concerning foster care licenses.
Title
Department of child services.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Mahan [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kubacki [R] | Rep. Gail Riecken [D] |
Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 111002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Roll Call 111001 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 111002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Roll Call 111001 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Public Law 123 |
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 415: yeas 87 and nays 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 295: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Head added second sponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-27 | House | Representative Macer added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 95 and nays 0 |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-23 | House | Senator Holdman added as sponsor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2014-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Kubacki, Riecken |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Mahan. |