IN HB1075 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation
Pending: Senate Commerce, Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a public agency to: (1) allow inspection or copying; or (2) make copies; of a public record within a reasonable time after the request is received by the agency. Provides that the court may impose a civil penalty against: (1) an officer of a public agency or an individual employed in a management level position with a public agency; or (2) the public agency; for violating the public records law or the open door law. Provides that the court may impose a civil penalty of: (1) not more than $100 for the first violation; and (2) not more than $500 for any additional violations. Provides that a court may: (1) impose only one civil penalty against an individual in an action even if the court finds that the individual committed multiple violations; and (2) impose another civil penalty against an individual in a separate action. Provides that if an officer of a state or local government agency orders a management level employee to: (1) not give proper notice of a public meeting or executive session; or (2) deny or interfere with a person's request to inspect or copy a public document; the employee is not subject to a civil penalty for violating the statute. Provides that if a local government agency has the capacity to send electronic mail, the agency shall provide notice to anyone (other than news media) that makes an annual request for notice by: (1) transmitting the notice by electronic mail; or (2) posting the notice on the agency's Internet web site (if the agency has an Internet web site). Provides that a court may not declare a governmental action void for failure to give notice by electronic mail or posting on the local government agency's web site, if the agency made a good faith effort to comply with the statute. Provides that a public agency may withhold personal information from public disclosure regarding an individual less than 18 years of age who participates in an activity conducted or supervised by a state educational institution, including personal information regarding the individual's parent or guardian. Requires (rather than allows) a court to review public records in camera to determine whether redaction of the records violates the public records act. If a formal complaint is filed, requires the public access counselor to review public records in camera without redaction (excluding redacted information that is the work product of an attorney and records that the agency is prohibited by law from disclosing) to determine whether the redaction of the records violated the access to public records act. Provides that unredacted documents that are in the possession of the public access counselor for in camera inspection are confidential while in the possession of the public access counselor. Creates an education fund for a program administered by the public access counselor to train public officials and educate the public on the rights of the public and the responsibilities of public agencies under the public access laws. Provides that a public agency has the discretion whether to disclose a public record requested by an offender containing personal information relating to a judge, law enforcement officer, or family member of a judge or law enforcement officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public access issues.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation
2010-01-19 Cosponsor: Senator Deig
2010-01-19 Senate sponsors: Senators Gard, Mrvan and Miller
2010-01-19 Referred to the Senate
2010-01-19 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 33: Yeas 97, Nays 0
2010-01-14 Amendment 1 (Stilwell), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-14 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-13 Representative Bartlett added as coauthor
2010-01-12 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-07 Representative Bosma added as coauthor
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2010-01-05 Coauthored by Representative Bauer
2010-01-05 Authored by Representative Stilwell

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback