IN HB1064 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Public Law 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Habitual offender requirements. Provides that to be sentenced as a habitual offender (other than for a conviction of a Level 1 through Level 4 felony or murder), a person must have accumulated at least one of the required number of prior unrelated felony convictions within 10 years of accumulating the current offense.
Title
Habitual offender requirements. Provides that to be sentenced as a habitual offender (other than for a conviction of a Level 1 through Level 4 felony or murder), a person must have accumulated at least one of the required number of prior unrelated felony convictions within 10 years of accumulating the current offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Public Law 12 |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as cosponsor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-14 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Head |
2017-02-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-07 | House | Representative Pierce added as coauthor |
2017-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |