IN HB1022 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Private university police departments. Provides that certain records of a private university police department relating to arrests or incarcerations for criminal offenses are public records. Allows a private university police department to withhold investigatory records. Provides that the name of a crime victim in records released by a private university police department must be redacted unless the release is authorized by the crime victim. Provides that an educational institution, a governing board of an educational institution, delegated office or offices of a governing board, or an individual employed by the educational institution as a police officer have the same immunities
Title
Private university police departments. Provides that certain records of a private university police department relating to arrests or incarcerations for criminal offenses are public records. Allows a private university police department to withhold investigatory records. Provides that the name of a crime victim in records released by a private university police department must be redacted unless the release is authorized by the crime victim. Provides that an educational institution, a governing board of an educational institution, delegated office or offices of a governing board, or an individual employed by the educational institution as a police officer have the same immunities
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Bauer [D] | Rep. Casey Cox [R] | Rep. Timothy Harman [R] | Rep. Christina Hale [D] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 350: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 246: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Glick) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2016-01-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative Hale added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Glick, Kruse, Broden |
2016-01-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 25: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2016-01-19 | House | Amendment #1 (Cox) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Amendment #3 (Bauer) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-13 | House | Representative Harman added as coauthor |
2016-01-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2016-01-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative Cox |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Bauer |