IN HB1013 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Geolocation information and unmanned aerial vehicles. Provides that, upon the request of a law enforcement agency, a provider of electronic communications services used by an electronic device is required to provide geolocation information concerning the electronic device to the law enforcement agency: (1) to allow the law enforcement agency to respond to a call for emergency services; or (2) in an emergency situation that involves the risk of death or serious bodily injury to an individual. Specifies that a law enforcement agency may make a request for geolocation information without first obtaining a search warrant or another judicial order that
Title
Geolocation information and unmanned aerial vehicles. Provides that, upon the request of a law enforcement agency, a provider of electronic communications services used by an electronic device is required to provide geolocation information concerning the electronic device to the law enforcement agency: (1) to allow the law enforcement agency to respond to a call for emergency services; or (2) in an emergency situation that involves the risk of death or serious bodily injury to an individual. Specifies that a law enforcement agency may make a request for geolocation information without first obtaining a search warrant or another judicial order that
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Lloyd Arnold [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] | Sen. Randall Head [R] |
Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Public Law 57 |
2016-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | Representative Speedy removed as coauthor |
2016-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 349: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2016-03-03 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senators Zakas and Kruse added as cosponsors |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Head) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2016-01-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative Speedy added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative Arnold added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Head and Steele |
2016-01-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2016-01-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Koch |