IN HB1005 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates Indiana's participation in the Midwest Greenhouse Gas Reduction Accord as of a certain date. Repeals the law concerning cancellation and reissuance by the auditor of state on certain outstanding warrants. Repeals law concerning a prohibition on construction of fences and bleachers on Evansville State Hospital property. Removes provisions allowing for violent crime victims compensation funding for loss or disability of a law enforcement animal. Specifies the rate of interest related to certain state payments is based on the average yield on state general fund money. Amends or repeals certain motor vehicles provisions, including references to street cars, buses, motorcycle permits, suspension of driving privileges, operating on an expired vehicle merchandising license, and specialized driving privileges. Removes funds used by the division of family resources in relation to programs for individuals with developmental disabilities from the list of funds to which the law concerning the financial services group of the office of the secretary of family and social services applies. Repeals the law concerning continuance of prosecution, treatment, and probation for individuals charged with or convicted of felonies related to drug or alcohol abuse and supervised by the division of mental health and addiction. Repeals provisions for voluntary and involuntary addiction treatment by the division of mental health and addiction. Changes the membership of the underground petroleum storage tank financial assurance board. Makes corrections to references to defunct environmental boards and language suggesting the existence of multiple boards with environmental rulemaking power. Repeals the responsible property transfer law. Repeals the pest control compact. Strikes a provision
Title
Government reduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 100503 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction - Roll Call 100501 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 100503 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction - Roll Call 100501 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | Public Law 113 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 513: yeas 78 and nays 20 |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules and Legislative Procedures pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 448: yeas 42 and nays 6 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Bray added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Schneider added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Riecken added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Bosma added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Shackleford added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative McMillin added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 278: yeas 42 and nays 6 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Boots added third sponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Buck added second sponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Public Policy |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative Goodin added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Schneider added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 165: yeas 79 and nays 15 |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1005 Amendment #6 (Pryor), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1005 Amendment #5 (Moed) motion withdrawn. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1005 Amendment #4 (VanDenburgh), failed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1005 Amendment #3 (Koch), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1005 Amendment #1 (McMillin), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Koch added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | House | Representative Huston added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Select Committee on Government Reduction |
2014-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative McMillin. |