IL SB4049 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $10,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services to implement Public Act 102-522 and provide grants to local school districts and community organizations for comprehensive personal health and safety education in kindergarten through the 5th grade and comprehensive sexual health education in the 6th through 12th grades. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
$DHS-SEXUAL HEALTH ED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Appropriations- Human Services |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4049&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/PDF/10200SB4049.pdf |