IL SB3023 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1097
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1097
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sexual Assault Survivors Emergency Treatment Act. Changes the definition of "follow-up healthcare" to mean specified healthcare services within 180 (instead of 90) days of the initial visit for medical forensic services. Makes corresponding changes.
Title
SEXUAL ASSAULT-WAIVER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1097 |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Effective Date June 16, 2022; Some Provisions Effective January 1, 2023 |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health; 012-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2022-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health; 013-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 1, 2022 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 013-000-000 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 70 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 1a-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 5.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 70 | 5.5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |