IL SB2396 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, from August 6, 2021 through August 8, 2021, and from August 13, 2021 through August 15, 2021, the tax imposed under the Acts on clothing and school supplies shall be at the rate of 1.25% (instead of 6.25%). Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TAX-HOLIDAY
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2396&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2396.htm |