IL SB2108 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Motor Carrier Safety Law of the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Department of State Police (instead of the Department of Transportation in conjunction with the Department of State Police) shall administer the Law. Amends the Illinois Hazardous Materials Transportation Act to provide that the Department of State Police (instead of the Department of Transportation) shall administer the Act. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that beginning fiscal year 2020, $20,000,000 shall be appropriated from the Road Fund to the Department of State Police to administer the Illinois Motor Carrier Safety Law and Illinois Hazardous Materials Safety Act. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
ISP-MOTOR CARRIER SAFETY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 8.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 30 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 18b-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 18b-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 18b-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 18b-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2108&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2108.htm |