IL SB1890 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Commercial Driver's License Act of the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the employer of an employee driver who drives a commercial motor vehicle may participate in the Employer Notification System. Provides that a request to participate in the employer notification system shall be accompanied by a fee. Provides that any fire department, police department, or other department or agency organized for the purposes of public safety and having official recognition of the city, county, city and county, district, or township in which the department or agency is located shall participate in the employer notification system but shall not be subject to the participation fee. Provides that the Secretary of State's Office shall adopt rules implementing the employer notification system.
Title
VEH CD-CDL-EMPLOYER NOTIFY
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1890&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1890.htm |