IL SB1358 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that an attorney or a corporation counsel appointed under this Section who is retained pursuant to an engagement letter or contract, is not exclusively employed by a single municipality, is not subject to a fixed term of office, and whose compensation is not required to be fixed shall not be deemed a municipal or public officer for purposes of the Illinois Municipal Code, the Public Officers Prohibited Activities Act, or the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act.
Title
MUNI CD-APPOINTED OFFICERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 3.1-30-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1358&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1358.htm |