IL SB0767 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that, in order to further the prevention of accidents, the Department of Transportation shall conduct a traffic study following the occurrence of any accident involving a fatality that occurs on a State highway. Provides that the study shall include, but not be limited to, consideration of alternative geometric design improvements, traffic control devices, and any other improvements that the Department deems necessary. Provides that the Department shall make the results of the study available to the public on its website. Effective immediately.
Title
TRAFFIC STUDY-ACCIDENT-FATAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-12-16 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2019-11-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-001-000 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 12, 2019 |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019 |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
610 | 107 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |