IL HB3386 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hydraulic Fracturing Regulatory Act. Provides that no person shall conduct high volume horizontal hydraulic fracturing operations in Illinois and that any high volume horizontal hydraulic fracturing permit issued before the effective date of the amendatory Act is revoked. Repeals the other substantive provisions of the Act. Repeals the Illinois Hydraulic Fracturing Tax Act and the State Finance Act provisions listing the Oil and Gas Resource Management Fund as a special fund.
Title
HYDRAULIC FRACTURING-PROHIBIT
Sponsors
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-12 | House | To Hydraulic Fracturing Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3386&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3386.htm |