IL HB3192 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that certain health care providers licensed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation who have applied for license renewal shall be presumed licensed until their license renewals have been approved or denied by the Department. Requires the Department to provide proof of temporary licensure renewal to a licensed health care provider who applies for renewal of his or her license and is in good standing. Provides that the Department may adopt rules to implement the provisions.
Title
HEALTH CARE LICENSE RENEWAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |