IL HB2449 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0264
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0264
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Service Member Civil Relief Act. Provides that any person or service member who enters military service may, at any time after receiving military orders to relocate for a period of service of at least 90 days, terminate or suspend certain specified contracts for service. Provides that termination or suspension of a contract must be made by delivery of a written or electronic notice, along with a copy of the service member's official military orders calling him or her to military service, to the specified service provider. Provides that a termination or suspension of service is effective on the day notice is given. Provides that a service member who terminates or suspends a contract for services, and who is no longer in active military service, may reinstate the provision of service upon providing written or electronic notice to the service provider that he or she is no longer on active military service. Provides that nothing shall be construed to conflict with the provisions of the federal Servicemembers Civil Relief Act, or any other applicable provision of the Act.
Title
SERVICE MEMBER RELIEF-CONTRACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0264 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-03-29 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed |
2017-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |