IL HB2449 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Service Member Civil Relief Act. Provides that any person or service member who enters military service may, at any time after receiving military orders to relocate for a period of service of at least 90 days, terminate or suspend certain specified contracts for service. Provides that termination or suspension of a contract must be made by delivery of a written or electronic notice, along with a copy of the service member's official military orders calling him or her to military service, to the specified service provider. Provides that a termination or suspension of service is effective on the day notice is given. Provides that a service member who terminates or suspends a contract for services, and who is no longer in active military service, may reinstate the provision of service upon providing written or electronic notice to the service provider that he or she is no longer on active military service. Provides that nothing shall be construed to conflict with the provisions of the federal Servicemembers Civil Relief Act, or any other applicable provision of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SERVICE MEMBER RELIEF-CONTRACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-29HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steven Reick
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3306313New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback