IL HB1032 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that a person who sells or gives any firearm to any person who has been convicted of a felony under the laws of this State or any other jurisdiction is guilty of a Class 3 (rather than a Class 4) felony. Creates the offense of use of a stolen firearm in the commission of an offense. Provides that a person commits the offense when he or she knowingly uses a stolen firearm in the commission of any offense and the person knows that the firearm was stolen. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony.
Title
CRIM CD-USE STOLEN FIREARMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0190 | |
2009-08-10 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-10 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-001 | |
2009-05-13 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-05-13 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-001 | |
2009-04-30 | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Firearms | |
2009-04-22 | Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-03-12 | Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-03-12 | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Flider |