ID H0622 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Motion to return to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee; return to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Motion to return to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee; return to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DIVORCE ACTIONS -- Amends existing law to provide for certain factors regarding the assignment of community property.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for certain factors regarding the assignment of community property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to return to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee; return to committee |
2022-02-24 | House | U.C. to return to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee; objection |
2022-02-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2022-02-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee without Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |