ID H0525 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC MONEYS -- Adds to existing law to prohibit governments in this state from expending funds to a provider of abortion and to provide exceptions.
Title
Adds to existing law to prohibit governments in this state from expending funds to a provider of abortion and to provide exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-03-03 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |