ID H0145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Pending: Senate Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Pending: Senate Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SELF-SERVICE STORAGE FACILITIES -- Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding rental agreements and liens, to provide for a procedure in the event of default where the property stored in the leased space is a vehicle or trailer, and to provide for when an operator may restrict access to the leased space.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding rental agreements and liens, to provide for a procedure in the event of default where the property stored in the leased space is a vehicle or trailer, and to provide for when an operator may restrict access to the leased space.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-05 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-05 | House | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 50-20-0 |
2019-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-01 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2019-02-27 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2019-02-27 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |