IA SSB3024 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2164
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2173
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2173
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2173.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2173.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to insurance companies acting as surety for bail bonds, including licensure requirements to act as a bail enforcement agent or business.(See SF 2173.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to insurance companies acting as surety for bail bonds, including licensure requirements to act as a bail enforcement agent or business.(See SF 2173.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2173. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 3:00PM Room 315. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Webster, and Weiner. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB547 (Related) 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2164.
HF2164 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 772.
SF2173 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 677.
HF2164 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 772.
SF2173 (Replaced by) 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 677.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3024 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3024.html |