IA SF2173 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 677.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 677.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to insurance companies acting as surety for bail bonds, including licensure requirements to act as a bail enforcement agent or business.(Formerly SSB 3024.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to insurance companies acting as surety for bail bonds, including licensure requirements to act as a bail enforcement agent or business.(Formerly SSB 3024.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 677. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | HF 2164 substituted. S.J. 676. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Attached to HF 2164. S.J. 550. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 189. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 179. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB547 (Related) 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2164.
SSB3024 (Related) 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2173.
HF2164 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 772.
SSB3024 (Related) 2024-01-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2173.
HF2164 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 772.